SC H3274 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That Political Subdivisions Of This State May Not Enact Any Laws, Ordinances, Or Rules Pertaining To Ingredients, Flavors, Or Licensing Of Cigarettes, Electronic Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, Or Alternative Nicotine Products; And To Provide That Such Laws, Ordinances, And Rules Enacted By A Political Subdivision Prior To January 1, 2019, Are Not Subject To The Preemption Imposed By This Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cigarettes and nicotine products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Rule 32b On H. 3274 (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 69 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-27HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-02-13HouseRoll call Yeas-69 Nays-37
2019-02-13HouseRead second time
2019-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: King
2019-02-06HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-02-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, West, Bannister
2019-01-30HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis, Hixon
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0492 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
449545(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback