SC H3234 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 38-71-48 So As To Enact The "hearing Aid Coverage For Children Act", To Provide Definitions, To Require Group Health Insurance And Group Health Benefit Plans To Cover Hearing Aids And Replacement Hearing Aids For An Insured With Impaired Hearing Who Is Eighteen Years Of Age Or Younger, To Provide For The Scope Of Coverage, And For Other Purposes.
Title
Hearing Aides Coverage for Children Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Huggins [R] | Rep. Cally Forrest [R] | Rep. Melissa Oremus [R] | Rep. Bart Blackwell [R] |
Rep. Sylleste Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis |
2021-02-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3234&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3234_20201209.htm |