SC H3224 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tedder, Jones, Bennett, Stringer, T.Moore, Willis, Robinson, Trantham, Oremus, Martin, White, Haddon, Morgan, W.Cox, Davis, Wetmore, Crawford, K.O.Johnson, Wheeler, M.M.Smith, Jefferson, R.Williams, Thigpen, Rivers, Yow, Gilliam, Brawley, Howard, J.L.Johnson, Garvin
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Sections 16-15-90 And 16-15-100, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Prostitution, So As To Add Prohibited Conduct And To Increase The Penalties For, Among Other Prohibitions, Solicitation Of Prostitution, Establishing Or Keeping A Brothel Or House Of Prostitution, Or Causing Or Inducing Another To Participate In Prostitution; To Establish The Affirmative Defense Of Being A Victim Of Human Trafficking For Certain Defendants, To Increase Certain Penalties When The Prostitute Has A Mental Disability, And For Other Purposes; And To Repeal Section 16-15-110 Relating To Prostitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prostitution

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Tedder, Jones, Bennett, Stringer, T.Moore, Willis, Robinson, Trantham, Oremus, Martin, White, Haddon, Morgan, W.Cox, Davis, Wetmore, Crawford, K.O.Johnson, Wheeler, M.M.Smith, Jefferson, R.Williams, Thigpen, Rivers, Yow, Gilliam, Brawley, Howard, J.L.Johnson, Garvin
2021-01-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0224 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1615100(n/a)See Bill Text
1615110(n/a)See Bill Text
161590(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback