SC S0224 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 16-15-90 And 16-15-100 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Prostitution, To Increase The Penalties For Solicitation Of Prostitution, Establishing Or Keeping A Brothel Or House Of Prostitution, Or Causing Or Inducing Another To Participate In Prostitution, To Establish The Affirmative Defense Of Being A Victim Of Human Trafficking, And To Increase The Penalties For Soliciting, Causing, Or Inducing Another For Or Into Prostitution If The Prostitute Has A Mental Disability; And To Repeal Section 16-15-110 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Prostitution Violations.
Title
Prostitution
Sponsors
Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] | Sen. Maymia McLeod [D] | Sen. Bradley Hutto [D] | Sen. Darrell Jackson [D] |
Sen. Thomas McElveen [D] | Sen. Margie Matthews [D] | Sen. Brian Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-1 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3224 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tedder, Jones, Bennett, Stringer, T.Moore, Willis, Robinson, Trantham, Oremus, Martin, White, Haddon, Morgan, W.Cox, Davis, Wetmore, Crawford, K.O.Johnson, Wheeler, M.M.Smith, Jefferson, R.Williams, Thigpen, Rivers, Yow, Gilliam, Brawley, Howard, J.L.Johnson, Garvin
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 15 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |