SC H3136 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-3790, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Exceptional Needs Tax Credit, So As To Provide That The Cumulative Maximum Annual Credit Amounts Are Increased To Provide A Scholarship To Any Exceptional Needs Child Of A Member Of The Armed Forces Of The United States And Who Is Either On Active Duty Or Was Killed In The Line Of Duty.
Title
Exceptional needs tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-31 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-01-31 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Amended |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons, Moore, Gilliard |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |