SC H3135 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Remove Certain Limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workforce Enhancement and Military Recognition Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-01HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-01-31HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-01-31HouseRoll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
2019-01-31HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons, Anderson, Henderson-Myers
2019-01-30HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-01-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
2019-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0179 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Finance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1261171(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback