SC H3121 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 12-6-3810 So As To Provide For An Income Tax Credit To A Property Owner Who Encumbers His Property With A Perpetual Recreational Trail Easement. - Ratified Title
Title
Recreational Trail Easement Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Act No. 125 | |
2024-05-29 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2024-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-08 | Ratified R 139 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2024-03-27 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-05-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0 |
2023-05-10 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-10 | House | Amended |
2023-05-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2023-05-09 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2023-04-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stavrinakis, Wetmore |
2023-04-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2023-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brewer, Robbins |
2023-03-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis |
2023-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bauer, Davis, M.M.Smith |
2023-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope |
2023-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Neese, T.Moore |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |