SC H3109 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 11 To Chapter 31, Title 23 So As To Impose A Seven Percent Fee On The Sale Of Handguns To Be Deposited In The "school Safety Fund" To Provide School Resource Officers.
Title
School Safety Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Wendy Brawley [D] | Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] | Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D] | Rep. Patricia Henegan [D] |
Rep. Krystle Matthews [D] | Rep. Rosalyn Henderson-Myers [D] | Rep. John King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers |
2019-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Simmons |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3109&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3109_20181218.htm |