SC H3102 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Abolish The Education Oversight Committee And The Commission On Higher Education On July 1, 2021, And Devolve Their Duties, Responsibilities, And Functions Upon The South Carolina Commission For Comprehensive Education Hereafter Created; By Adding Chapter 75 To Title 59 So As To Establish The South Carolina Commission For Comprehensive Education And Provide For Its Membership, Organization, And Functions Including Being The Lead Agency To Coordinate And Implement The Provisions Of Chapter 76, Title 59 Relating To The Initiatives For Lifelong Learning; And By Adding Chapter 76 To Title 59 So As To Provide For A Seamless System Of Educational Initiatives Designed To Include Every Level Of Education From Early Childhood Education Through Graduate Studies Known As The "p-20 Educational System For Preschool Through Age 20".
Title
Abolish the Education Oversight Committee and Commission on Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4577 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary