RI S3136 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Submit The Following Question To The Qualified Electors Of The State At The Next General Election In 2024: "shall There Be A Convention To Amend Or Revise The Constitution?" (this Resolution Would Provide For The Presentation Of The Following Question At The Next General Election "shall There Be A Convention To Amend Or Revise The Constitution?")
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION TO SUBMIT THE FOLLOWING QUESTION TO THE QUALIFIED ELECTORS OF THE STATE AT THE NEXT GENERAL ELECTION IN 2024: "SHALL THERE BE A CONVENTION TO AMEND OR REVISE THE CONSTITUTION?" (This resolution would provide for the presentation of the following question at the next general election "Shall there be a convention to amend or revise the Constitution?")
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2024) |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |