RI S3073 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Affirming That The General Assembly Of The State Of Rhode Island And Providence Plantations Shall Give Due Consideration To The Recommendations Of The Rhode Island Statewide Task Force To Address Adult Sexual Assault And Will Work Toward Legislative Implementation Of Those Recommendations
Title
Senate Resolution Affirming That The General Assembly Of The State Of Rhode Island And Providence Plantations Shall Give Due Consideration To The Recommendations Of The Rhode Island Statewide Task Force To Address Adult Sexual Assault And Will Work Toward Legislative Implementation Of Those Recommendations
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |