RI S3060 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the provisions of the charter of River Bend Cemetery Company pertaining to the board of trustees.
Title
In Amendment Of To Incorporate The Westerly Cemetery Company As Amended
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | House voted to recommit to House Corporations |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to House Corporations |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/04/2014) |