RI S3044 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Coventry to issue not more than $10,710,000 in bonds to repair, replace and improvement the town's infrastructure.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Coventry To Finance The Design, Construction, Repair, Rehabilitation And Improvement Of Streets, Sidewalks And Bridges In The Town, Including, But Not Limited To, Paving, Drainage, Traffic Control Devices, Road Maintenance Equipment, Safety Improvements And Landscaping By The Issuance Of Not More Than $10,710,000 Bonds And Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |