RI S3028 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Cranston to issue not more than $15,000,000 general obligation bonds and temporary notes to finance the improvement, renovation, repair, alteration and equipping of schools and school facilities in the city of Cranston.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Cranston To Finance The Improvement, Renovation, Repair, Alteration And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities In The City By The Issuance Of Not More Than $15,000,000 General Obligation Bonds And Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |