RI S3005 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Review And Make Recommendations Regarding The Efficient And Effective Administration Of Health And Human Services Programs In The State Of Rhode Island (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Review And Make Recommendations Regarding Health And Human Services Programs In Ri, From July 1, 2022, To September 1, 2022, And Would Expire On January 1, 2023.)
Title
Senate Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Review And Make Recommendations Regarding The Efficient And Effective Administration Of Health And Human Services Programs In The State Of Rhode Island (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Review And Make Recommendations Regarding Health And Human Services Programs In Ri, From July 1, 2022, To September 1, 2022, And Would Expire On January 1, 2023.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2022) |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S3005.pdf |