RI S3002 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the town of South Kingstown to issue not more than $1,000,000 bonds and notes to finance the construction, furnishing, equipping and landscaping of a community recreation center in the town.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of South Kingstown To Finance The Construction, Furnishing, Equipping And Landscaping Of A Community Recreation Center In The Town By The Issuance Of Not More Than $1,000,000 Bonds, Notes And/or Other Evidences Of Indebtedness Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/03/2014) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |