RI S2998 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide efforts to develop and expand career pathways to secure employment to be overseen by the human resource investment council.
Title
Rhode Island Human Resources Investment Council
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. James Doyle [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |