RI S2995 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the administration of the division of motor vehicles to make available, to Purple Heart Medal recipients, up to two (2) sets of special registration plates.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2022) |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |