RI S2989 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Food And Drugs - Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Title
An Act Relating To Food And Drugs - Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. Leo Blais [R] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Beatrice Lanzi [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-09 | House passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-09 | Senate read and passed | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on Senate Calendar |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2989.pdf |