RI S2987 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the department of administration to add the names of Rhode Island residents who were killed in the terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001, to be added to the 9/11 Memorial located in the state house.
Title
Relating To The 9/11 Memorial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018) |