RI S2970 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-11 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-11 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- REGULATION OF RENTAL OF MOTORIZED BICYCLES, MOTOR SCOOTERS AND MOTORIZED TRICYCLES IN NEW SHOREHAM - Grants the authority to the town council to enact ordinances establishing procedures and standards related to rider safety and competence training protocols for operators of motorized bicycles, motor scooters and motorized tricycles in New Shoreham.
Title
Grants the authority to the town council to enact ordinances establishing procedures and standards related to rider safety and competence training protocols for operators of motorized bicycles, motor scooters and motorized tricycles in New Shoreham.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2024) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Motor And Other Vehicles
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- REGULATION OF RENTAL OF MOTORIZED BICYCLES, MOTOR SCOOTERS AND MOTORIZED TRICYCLES IN NEW SHOREHAM
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- REGULATION OF RENTAL OF MOTORIZED BICYCLES, MOTOR SCOOTERS AND MOTORIZED TRICYCLES IN NEW SHOREHAM