RI S2969 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the higher education assistance authority and the governor's workforce board to perform a study of the feasibility of establishing a state administered lifelong learning savings account program.
Title
Higher Education Assistance Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Senate | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |