RI S2956 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows state employees who had also been a correctional officer to elect to combine their service time earned from each job, for the determination of their retirement eligibility date and calculation of retirement benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-08SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-06-07SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback