RI S2947 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the reporting of any sexual abuse of a child by an employee, agent, contractor or volunteer of an education program defined in the Rhode Island general laws.
Title
Abused And Neglected Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Neglected children approval of amendment lc 005892/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Neglected children approval of amendment lc 005892/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2016) |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |