RI S2920 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the town of Scituate to adopt tax rates for different tax classifications.
Title
Tax Classification In The Town Of Scituate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2014) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |