RI S2902 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- CONTRACTORS BONDS - Provides that upon application, and good cause, the state may waive the bonding requirement for certified minority business enterprises or women owned businesses.
Title
Provides that upon application, and good cause, the state may waive the bonding requirement for certified minority business enterprises or women owned businesses.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2902.pdf |