RI S2898 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- NOISE LIMITS FOR MOTOR VEHICLES - Enables municipalities to install and use automated systems to detect noise limit violations in order to enhance enforcement abilities and reduce noise violations state-wide.
Title
Enables municipalities to install and use automated systems to detect noise limit violations in order to enhance enforcement abilities and reduce noise violations state-wide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2898.pdf |