RI S2896 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Matthew Cohen to join Jenilee Wirtz and Chad Porterfield in marriage on or about June 28, 2020, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-27 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |