RI S2885 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FOOD AND DRUGS -- THE RHODE ISLAND CANNABIS ACT - Permits hybrid cannabis cultivators to advertise regarding cannabis products during the transitional period.
Title
Permits hybrid cannabis cultivators to advertise regarding cannabis products during the transitional period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-12 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2024) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |