RI S2871 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- PSYCHOLOGISTS - Includes licensed school psychologists under the provisions of the general laws governing the regulations of psychologists and expands the licensing of school psychologists for independent practice.
Title
Includes licensed school psychologists under the provisions of the general laws governing the regulations of psychologists and expands the licensing of school psychologists for independent practice.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2871.pdf |