RI S2869 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FOOD AND DRUGS -- THE GOOD SAMARITAN OVERDOSE PREVENTION ACT OF 2016 - Requires the director of the department of health to provide guidance to non-governmental employers and the public on acquiring opioid antagonist medication and training for its use.
Title
Requires the director of the department of health to provide guidance to non-governmental employers and the public on acquiring opioid antagonist medication and training for its use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2869.pdf |