RI S2868 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the general assembly appropriate funds to the state librarian for the purpose of caring for, preserving and cataloguing property in the state in the keeping of the Rhode Island Black Heritage Society.
Title
Historical Society Libraries
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2868.pdf |