RI S2867 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Makes driving under the influence with any child under thirteen (13) years of age in the vehicle a felony punishable by up to five (5) years imprisonment, a five thousand dollar ($5,000) fine, and a loss of license of up to two (2) years.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-15 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2018) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |