RI S2854 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Central Falls to adopt 3 separate tax classifications of residential property consisting of tax rates: owner-occupied property of 5 units or less/dwellings of 6 units or more/non owner-occupied property of 5 units or less, including mixed use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes--city Of Central Falls

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateSenate read and passed
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-05SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-05-29SenateMeeting postponed (05/29/2018)
2018-05-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-05-03SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback