RI S2853 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $100,000 To Year Up Providence (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000) To Year Up Providence.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $100,000 To Year Up Providence (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000) To Year Up Providence.)
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2853.pdf |