RI S2823 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a seven (7) member public-private partnership infrastructure oversight commission to approve all requests for proposals submitted for public-private partnership construction of qualified facilities.
Title
Public-private Partnership Infrastructure Program
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2823.pdf |