RI S2794 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the hospital conversions act and would set additional guidelines for the department of health to consider when considering conversions of either for profit or nonprofit hospitals or their affiliates which is defined within this act.
Title
The Hospital Conversions Act
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2794.pdf |