RI S2780 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires pet shops to only sell cats or dogs obtained from an animal shelter, dog pound or animal rescue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback