RI S2765 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- CITY HOUSING AUTHORITIES - Establishes the composition of the housing authority for the city of Central Falls.
Title
Establishes the composition of the housing authority for the city of Central Falls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2024) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |