RI S2759 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Anne M. Moniz to join Martha M. Rodriguez and Eric Flanders in marriage on or about June 16, 2018, within the Town of Jamestown, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-15 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-05-11 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/15/2018) |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/12/2018) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |