RI S2747 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permit a pharmacy to provide a compounded drug to a practitioner for administration in a physician's office.
Title
Pharmacies--compounded Prescription Labeling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2014) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |