RI S2744 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that beginning in FY 2017, the state would pay the local share of charter public school tuition for certain students in high density charter public schools.
Title
Relating To Education
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee heard |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2016) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2744.pdf |