RI S2737 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legalizes the taking of wild migratory birds by crossbow.
Title
Birds
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] |
Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2016) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2737.pdf |