RI S2726 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES - Prohibits insurance companies from paying a rate that is less than the approved Medicaid rate set by the executive office of health and human services.
Title
Prohibits insurance companies from paying a rate that is less than the approved Medicaid rate set by the executive office of health and human services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2726.pdf |