RI S2718 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the law enforcement officers' bill of rights to provide greater accountability in the disciplinary process over law enforcement.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill Of Rights
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2022) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2718.pdf |