RI S2714 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits individuals served with protective orders in domestic abuse/assault from terminating/disrupting utility service without prior court approval.
Title
Public Utilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-10 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/09/2016) |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2016) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |