RI S2709 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make the use of a hand-held mobile phone while driving a commercial motor vehicle a traffic violation in accordance with federal regulations.
Title
Rhode Island Uniform Commercial Driver's License Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2014) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |