RI S2704 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers (would Amend The Penalties For Pipeline Safety Violations Committed In Ri To Be Consistent With Federal Law, Thereby Ensuring That The State Is Able To Retain Its Annual Federal Enforcement Certification Status.)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers (would Amend The Penalties For Pipeline Safety Violations Committed In Ri To Be Consistent With Federal Law, Thereby Ensuring That The State Is Able To Retain Its Annual Federal Enforcement Certification Status.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-22 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-22 | House passed as amended in concurrence | |
2012-05-16 | Placed on House Calendar (05/22/2012) | |
2012-05-16 | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence | |
2012-05-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2012) | |
2012-04-12 | Referred to House Corporations | |
2012-04-12 | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/12/2012) | |
2012-04-10 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-04-05 | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2012) | |
2012-03-22 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2012) | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2704.pdf |