RI S2699 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES AND OTHER VEHICLES -- REGISTRATION OF VEHICLES - Removes the requirement that the applicant for a Bronze Star Medal license plate pay a registration fee or transfer charge.
Title
Removes the requirement that the applicant for a Bronze Star Medal license plate pay a registration fee or transfer charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2699.pdf |