RI S2694 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - Referred to House Special Legislation
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - Referred to House Special Legislation
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- REGISTRATION FEES - Disabled veteran license plate may be transferred to veterans' spouse or issued to veteran or veterans spouse.
Title
Disabled veteran license plate may be transferred to veterans' spouse or issued to veteran or veterans spouse.
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/14/2024) |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2024) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |